Dhillon, Jasvinder Singh (CPSO#: 65648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rutherford Medical Centre
Suite 3
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone: (905) 264-8311
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jasvinder S Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dhillon ( CPSO# 65648 )

Business Address:
5283 Rutherford Road
Suite 3
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone Number: (905) 264-8311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASVINDER SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1993