Dhillon, Karamvir Kaur (CPSO#: 90256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Pune, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B8
Phone: (905) 721-6159
Fax: (905) 721-6619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dhillon ( CPSO# 90256 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-6159

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARAMVIR KAUR DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010