Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Dhillon, Mohan Deep Singh (CPSO#: 61488)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992