Dhillon, Rajwinder Singh (CPSO#: 88162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Eugenio Maria De Hostos University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone: (289) 296-6194
Fax: (289) 296-4519
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajwinder S. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dhillon ( CPSO# 88162 )

Business Address:
102 - 4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone Number: (289) 296-6194

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 15 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJWINDER SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2008 to 30 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2009