Dhillon, Rupinder Singh (CPSO#: 88404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50554
Fax: (905) 494-6481
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: 519-941-2410 Ext. 2258
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

iHealth Centre
6175 Hwy 7, Units 19-22
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Canada
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.S. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 30 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUPINDER SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 31 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014