Dhillon, Yadwinder Singh (CPSO#: 104762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Russian

Education:Tver State Medical Academy, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
444 Douno Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Canada
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Canada
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yadwinder Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Dhillon ( CPSO# 104762)

Business Address:
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
107 - 444 Douno Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 273-0100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YADWINDER SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2016