Dhiman, Surender Paul (CPSO#: 27468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois
USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SURENDER PAUL DHIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHIMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975