Dhindsa, Navjot Kaur (CPSO#: 85324)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University India, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 15 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 26 Jul 2006
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2008
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2008