Dhiraj, Navraj Singh (CPSO#: 73728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawthorne Village Medical Clinic
Suite 205
10220 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7J3
Phone: (905) 878-0676
Fax: (905) 878-0521
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6941 Derry Road
Suite B-02
Milton ON  L9T 7H5
Canada
Phone: (905) 875-9999
Fax: (905) 875-9941
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Navraj S Dhiraj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dhiraj ( CPSO# 73728 )

Business Address:
Suite 1B
6941 Derry Rd.
Milton ON  L9T 7H5
Phone Number: (905) 875-9999

Business Address:
205 - 10220 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7J3
Phone Number: (905) 878-0676

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVRAJ SINGH DHIRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHIRAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001