Di Costanzo, Giovanni Angelo (CPSO#: 52485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Urology
Suite 304
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-7120
Fax: (905) 472-2971
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIOVANNI ANGELO DI COSTANZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI COSTANZO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1988