Di Giacomo, Donato Anthony (CPSO#: 67025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 800
2 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4T 2T5
Phone: (416) 347-2061
Fax: (647) 846-8622
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donato Anthony Di Giacomo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Di Giacomo ( CPSO# 67025 )

Business Address:
Suite 800
2 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4T 2T5
Phone Number: (416) 347-2061

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONATO ANTHONY DI GIACOMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI GIACOMO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998