Di Gravio, Bruno (CPSO#: 53960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
525 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 210
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 743-0516
Fax: (519) 743-0558
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. DiGravio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Di Gravio ( CPSO# 53960 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 743-0516

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUNO DI GRAVIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI GRAVIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1985