Di Gregorio, Roland Carmen (CPSO#: 69112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
3 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2B3
Phone: (905) 304-8937
Fax: (905) 304-7031
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROLAND CARMEN DI GREGORIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI GREGORIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997