Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Di Nicola, Vincenzo Giovanni Franco (CPSO#: 57227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Portuguese

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chef de pedopsychiatrie
Hopital Maisonneuve-Rosemont
Pavillon Rosemont
5689 Boulevard Rosemont
Montreal QC  H1T 2H1
Phone: (514) 252-3923
Fax: (514) 252-3931
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4201 rue Ontario est
Montreal QC  H1V 1K2
Canada
Phone: (514) 253-9717 Ext. 15561
Fax: (514) 522-1963
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENZO GIOVANNI FRANCO DI NICOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI NICOLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1986