Di Pasquale, Dennis John (CPSO#: 71426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 949-8855
Fax: (905) 949-6176
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7557
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis Di Pasquale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fenech ( CPSO# 77133 )
Dr. D. Di Pasquale ( CPSO# 71426 )

Business Address:
Suite 410
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 949-8855

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS JOHN DI PASQUALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI PASQUALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002