Di Primio, Luigia Anna (CPSO#: 66572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Halton Healthcare Service - OTMH
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville, ON
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905 845 2571 Ext. 2358
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Di Primio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Di Primio ( CPSO# 66572 )

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIGIA ANNA DI PRIMIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI PRIMIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999