Di Quinzio, Melanie Louise (CPSO#: 84879)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 31 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012