Di Santo, Loredana (CPSO#: 79056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 417-7899
Fax: (905) 417-8905
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Di Santo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Di Santo ( CPSO# 79056 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 417-7899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOREDANA DI SANTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI SANTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005