DiBartolo, Marielena Linda (CPSO#: 77747)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2005 to 16 Jan 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2007 to 14 Feb 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2007