DiNicolo, Lisa Sandra (CPSO#: 80864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital, Freeport Site
3570 King St E
Kitchener, ON
N2A 2W1
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa DiNicolo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. DiNicolo ( CPSO# 80864 )

Business Address:
2 O'Conner Drive
Toronto ON  M4L 2K1
Phone Number: (416) 467-3080

Business Address:
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA SANDRA DINICOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINICOLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2006