Diachun, Laura Lee (CPSO#: 66543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Main Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4021
Fax: (519) 685-4093
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Diachun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Diachun ( CPSO# 66543 )

Business Address:
Suite A2-129
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4021


Corporation Name: Niamh A. O'Regan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Diachun ( CPSO# 66543 )
Dr. N. O'Regan ( CPSO# 108794)

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4021

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA LEE DIACHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIACHUN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997