Diamandis, Phedias (CPSO#: 95599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 4459
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHEDIAS DIAMANDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAMANDIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016