Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Apr 2015
Summary:
On April 7, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Egles committed an act of professional misconduct in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Egles admitted to the allegation.
Dr. Egles entered into a contract with the Physician Health Program (“PHP Contract”) dated January 8, 2009, which was amended several times between February 2009 and November 2011.
In about August 2011, in breach of her PHP Contract, Dr. Egles wrote a prescription to herself in a colleague’s name and worked at a nursing home when her PHP contract prohibited her from working. The PHP reported these breaches to the College, which led to Dr. Egles entering into an Undertaking with the College on April 16, 2012 whereby she agreed that if she failed to comply with her PHP Contract “…such action may constitute a breach of this undertaking, and an act of professional misconduct.”
On April 18, 2013, the College received a letter from the PHP reporting that Dr. Egles was in breach of her PHP Contract.
On October 31, 2014, Dr. Egles entered into a health monitoring undertaking directly with the College which includes restrictions on her hours of work and patient load.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Egles’ certificate of registration for a two month period effective May 7, 2015.
- Dr. Egles appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Egles pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.