Dias, Francis (CPSO#: 45511)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999