Diaz Bobadilla, Julio Fernando (CPSO#: 56276)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of San Carlos, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records requests should be sent to: 402 - 1630 Pandosy Street Kelowena, BC V1Y 1P7
Date Received: 06 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003