Diaz-Hermosillo, Pablo (CPSO#: 55042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Complex Mental Schizophrenia
C.A.M.H.
Unit 2, Suite 301
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32799
Fax: (416) 583-1257
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

THE ANNE JOHNSTON HEALTH STATION
2398 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-866
Fax: (416) 486-8660
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diaz-Hermosillo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Diaz-Hermosillo ( CPSO# 55042 )

Business Address:
Schizophrenia Program
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Suite 301
1001 Queen Street West - Unit 2
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PABLO DIAZ-HERMOSILLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAZ-HERMOSILLO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 28 Feb 1986
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1999