Dick, Alexander James (CPSO#: 71417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
Rooom H-3408-A
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4231
Fax: (613) 761-4338
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Dick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dick ( CPSO# 71417 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
Room H-3408-A
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4231

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 13 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER JAMES DICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2003