Dick, Arthur George (CPSO#: 26625)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011