Dick, Brian Douglas (CPSO#: 59708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
52 Cramer Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 5X7
Phone: (613) 596-3026
Fax: (613) 226-2589
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DOUGLAS DICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989