Dick, Paul Thomas (CPSO#: 59942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
8th Wing
P O Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2864
Fax: (519) 370-2388
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul T. Dick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dick ( CPSO# 59942 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Unit 8-2 - 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL THOMAS DICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989