Dickhout, Janet Spaulding (CPSO#: 50431)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: University of Toronto Student Health Service 214 College Street Toronto ON M5T 2Z9
Date Received: 18 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018