Dickie, Andrew John Dundas (CPSO#: 63687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RS McLaughlin Durham Regional
Cancer Centre
Suite C2 160F
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4808
Fax: (905) 433-4577
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. John Dickie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dickie ( CPSO# 63687 )

Business Address:
RS McLaughlin Durham Regional
Cancer Centre
Suite C2 160F
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN DUNDAS DICKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICKIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1992