Dickie, Nadine Rosemary (CPSO#: 65272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Southampton Site
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-3230
Fax: (519) 797-1247
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grey Bruce Health Services
1800-8Th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: (519) 376-2121
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Southhampton Care Centre
140 Grey Street
Southampton ON  N0L 2L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 797-3220
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadine Dickie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dickie ( CPSO# 65272 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Southampton Site
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-3230

Business Address:
Southhampton Care Centre
140 Grey Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-3220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE ROSEMARY DICKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICKIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993