Dickinson, Archie Willard (CPSO#: 71653)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2009