Dickman, John Hewett (CPSO#: 27148)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017