Dickson, Brendan Craig (CPSO#: 79408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pathology & Laboratory Medicine
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDAN CRAIG DICKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICKSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2009