Dickson, Christine (CPSO#: 55628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
770 Broadview Avenue Suite 206
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 729-9355
Fax: (613) 729-9350
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Outpatient Mental Health A6
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16787
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE DICKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICKSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1988