Dickson, John Turnbull (CPSO#: 19345)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Oct 1993