Dickson, Lisa Marie (CPSO#: 86462)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: Publicover, Lisa Marie (used until: 24 Oct 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.M. Dickson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 22 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2010 to 22 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 2015