Dickson, Paul John (CPSO#: 23634)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2016

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)