Didyk, Nicole Elaine (CPSO#: 70028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6425
Fax: (519) 749-6498
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Didyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 28 2015


Corporation Name: Theal Didyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Theal ( CPSO# 69924 )
Dr. N. Didyk ( CPSO# 70028 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6425

Business Address:
564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 208
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 576-3099

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE ELAINE DIDYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIDYK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2004