Dietrich, Jeanette Louise (CPSO#: 73663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3113 Rutledge Rd, P.O. Box 270
3113 Rutledge Rd, P.O. Box 270
Sydenham ON  K0H 2T0
Phone: (613) 376-3327
Fax: (613) 376-9868
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wang Dietrich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dietrich ( CPSO# 73663 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Providence Care
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
3113 Rutledge Road
PO Box 270
Sydenham ON  K0H 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 376-3327

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEANETTE LOUISE DIETRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIETRICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001