Dignan, Thomas Albert (CPSO#: 50437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
345 Ecclestone Dr. unit 1066
Bracebridge Ont
P1L 1R1
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1W3
Phone: (705) 640-0055
Fax: (888) 726-9393
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS ALBERT DIGNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIGNAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2001
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 25 Oct 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Oct 2001
Summary:

 On October 24, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Thomas Dignan(s guilty plea and found 
 him guilty of failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession relating to the 
 failed resuscitation of a patient.  The Committee ordered the following penalty:

(a) 	a 
 reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register; 
(b) 	that a condition be 
 imposed on his certificate that he is prohibited from performing 	general anaesthesia or conscious 
 sedation until such time as he 
(i) successfully completes the Advanced Cardiac Life Support 
 course and provides 	written proof to the Registrar and 

(ii) that he sucessfully completes a 
 minimum 3 day assessment of his anaesthetic skills at 	Macmaster Medical Center and is certified 
 in writing by the assessors as competent and 	safe as a GP anaesthetis in a community based 
 practice and provides proof of this.  These 	are at his expense.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 24, 2001