Diksic, Dubravka Ana (CPSO#: 72176)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2009