Dill-Macky, Marcus John (CPSO#: 72711)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010