Dillon, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 57248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: Duncan, Julie Anne (used until: 06 Oct 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE DILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1988