Dimitrakoudis, Dimitrios Peter (CPSO#: 70112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
suite 4S-406
Sunnyside building
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 604-9500
Fax: (416) 604-1560
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
Medicine - Neurology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dimitrios P. Dimitrakoudis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dimitrakoudis ( CPSO# 70112 )

Business Address:
Room 4S-406
30 The Queesway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 604-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 05 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIMITRIOS PETER DIMITRAKOUDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIMITRAKOUDIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002