Dimitri, Daneilla (CPSO#: 106146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: 705 435 3377
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Port Perry
451 Paxton St
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANEILLA DIMITRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIMITRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017