Din, Fareen Adnan (CPSO#: 87514)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2013