Dindar, Farouk (CPSO#: 27980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1975


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Agincourt Professional Centre
Suite 409
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 282-4935
Fax: (416) 282-0776
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 13 - 1 High Meadow Pl Toronto ON M9L 0A3 tel: 1.800.775.0093 fax: 647.933.2904 info@recordsregistry.ca www.recordsregistry.ca
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 30 Jan 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. FAROUK DINDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINDAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1975